Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022