LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2087
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2087
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2087
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 10, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 3, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 23, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 19, 2022
Analysis
March 10, 2022
Analysis
February 3, 2022
Analysis
January 27, 2022
Analysis
January 24, 2022