Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 30, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022