Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2107 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022