Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2022
Analysis April 1, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022