House
|
03/30/2022
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Udall motioned that the House extend its action of Thursday, March 17, 2022, whereby it passed the motion to extend the time to reconsider its third reading action of HB 2125 and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion passed v/v.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Udall motioned that the House extend its action of Thursday, March 3, 2022, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its third reading action of HB 2125 and that the time for reconsideration be extended another 14 days. Motion passed v/v.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (29-27-2-2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|