Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022