Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022