House | 03/15/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-2-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Assigned to House COM Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |