Senate
|
07/06/2022
|
Chapter 369
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-6-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (32-17-11-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House final reading FAILED, voting: (30-19-11-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
House Conference adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate Conference adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2022
|
Senate Conference caucus date
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2022
|
House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2022
|
House Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Senate Conference members: MESNARD, LIVINGSTON, STEELE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Senate Conference appointed
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House Conference members: WENINGER, EPSTEIN, WILMETH
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2022
|
House Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-4-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate FIN Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|