Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2237 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 19, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022