Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022