Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 24, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 1, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022