Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022