House | 02/17/2022 | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Assigned to House GE Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |