Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 15, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis June 15, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022