Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022