Arizona 2022 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2330 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/01/2022

                    Assigned to JUD 	FOR COMMITTEE 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2330 
 
department of public safety; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Department of Public Safety (DPS) for eight years. 
Background 
DPS is responsible for creating and coordinating services for use by local law enforcement 
agencies in protecting the public safety. DPS must formulate plans with a view of establishing 
modern services for prevention of crime, apprehension of violators, training of law enforcement 
personnel and the promotion of public safety (A.R.S. § 41-1711). 
The Senate Judiciary Committee of Reference and the House Military Affairs and Public 
Safety Committee of Reference met jointly on December 9, 2021, to conduct a review of DPS. 
The Joint Committees of Reference recommended DPS be continued for eight years. DPS is set to 
terminate on July 1, 2022, unless legislation is enacted for its continuance (A.R.S. § 41-3022.11). 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation. 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, DPS until July 1, 2030. 
2. Repeals DPS on January 1, 2031. 
3. Contains a purpose statement. 
4. Becomes effective on the general effective date.   
House Action 
MAPS 1/31/22 DP 15-0-0-0 
3
rd
 Read 2/10/22  56-0-4  
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 1, 2022 
ZD/HK/sr