Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2330 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 03/30/2022

                            House Engrossed   department of public safety; continuation           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022           CHAPTER 83       HOUSE BILL 2330            An Act   repealing section 41-3022.11, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.11; relating to the department of public safety.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

House Engrossed   department of public safety; continuation
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
CHAPTER 83
HOUSE BILL 2330

House Engrossed

 

department of public safety; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-fifth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2022

 

 

 

CHAPTER 83

 

HOUSE BILL 2330

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3022.11, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.11; relating to the department of public safety.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3022.11, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.11, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.11. Department of public safety; termination July 1, 2030 A. The department of public safety terminates on July 1, 2030. B. Title 41, chapter 12 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the department of public safety to prevent crime, apprehend violators, train law enforcement personnel and promote public safety. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3022.11, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.11, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3030.11. Department of public safety; termination July 1, 2030

A. The department of public safety terminates on July 1, 2030.

B. Title 41, chapter 12 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2031. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the department of public safety to prevent crime, apprehend violators, train law enforcement personnel and promote public safety.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 29, 2022.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 29, 2022. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR MARCH 29, 2022.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 29, 2022.