Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022