Assigned to ED FOR COMMITTEE ARIZONA STATE SENATE Fifty-Fifth Legislature, Second Regular Session FACT SHEET FOR H.B. 2352 school facilities oversight board; continuation Purpose Continues the School Facilities Oversight Board (SFOB) for three years. Background In 2021, the Legislature transferred the School Facilities Board's duties to the newly-established Division of School Facilities (Division) and SFOB within the Arizona Department of Administration (ADOA) (Laws 2021, Chapter 404). The SFOB must: 1) review and approve student school district population projections to determine New School Facilities Fund distributions; 2) certify that new school facilities plans meet building adequacy standards; 3) approve or reject school district requests to reduce pupil square footage; 4) adopt minimum facility adequacy guidelines for the Arizona Schools for the Deaf and Blind; 5) administer the Lease-To-Own Fund; 6) review the Division's polices for administering the Emergency Deficiencies Correction Fund and the Building Renewal Grant Fund; and 7) report as outlined regarding the SFOB's actions. The SFOB may authorize revenue bonds for outlined expenses (A.R.S. §§ 41-5702; 41-5703; 41-5721; and 41-5731). The SFOB consists of seven Governor-appointed members who serve four-year terms and the Superintendent of Public Instruction and Director of the ADOA serving as nonvoting advisory members. SFOB membership includes two members who are owners or officers of a private construction company, who have experience in constructing large buildings and whose businesses do not include school construction and: 1) one representative of a statewide organization of taxpayers; 2) one registered professional architect; 3) one registered professional engineer; 4) one person with experience in public school facilities management; and 5) one representative of the business community (A.R.S. § 41-5701.02). The House Education Committee of Reference and Senate Education Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on Tuesday, January 11, 2022, to review the performance audit and sunset review conducted by the Office of the Auditor General, evaluate the SFOB's response to the sunset factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the SFOB be continued for three years until July 1, 2025 (COR Report). The SFOB terminates on July 1, 2022, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3022.18). There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. Provisions 1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2022, the SFOB until July 1, 2025. FACT SHEET H.B. 2352 Page 2 2. Repeals the SFOB on January 1, 2026, if: a) the SFOB has no outstanding state school facilities revenue bonds, state school improvement revenue bonds and lease-to-own transactions; or b) the Legislature has otherwise provided for paying or retiring any outstanding state school facilities revenue bonds, state school improvement revenue bonds and lease-to-own transactions. 3. Repeals the SFOB, if neither of the conditions relating to outstanding revenue bonds and lease- to-own transactions are met by January 1, 2026, 30 days after the retirement of all revenue bonds and any outstanding lease-to-own transactions. 4. Contains a purpose statement. 5. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted. House Action ED 2/1/22 DP 10-0-0-0 3 rd Read 2/10/22 56-0-4 Prepared by Senate Research March 18, 2022 LB/MS/slp