Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022