Senate | 03/22/2022 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |