LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2374
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2374
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2022 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2374
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 13, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 22, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 17, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 18, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 12, 2022
Analysis
April 6, 2022
Analysis
March 24, 2022
Analysis
February 28, 2022
Analysis
February 21, 2022
Analysis
February 9, 2022
Analysis
February 7, 2022