Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 23, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022