Senate | 03/16/2022 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House WM Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |