Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022