Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022