Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022