Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 1, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill June 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 7, 2022
Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022