House | 02/24/2022 | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House motion to reconsider third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |