Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 23, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022