Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Chapter 181
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (35-22-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|