Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 16, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022