Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022