Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 5, 2022
Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2022