Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2573 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022