Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 12, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022