Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022