Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2587 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022