Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022