Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Chapter 249
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-1-5-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (49-10-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|