Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022