Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022