Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2610 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill June 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 7, 2022
Analysis April 13, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022