|
05/27/2022
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (31-26-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|