Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Senate NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|