House | 02/28/2022 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time |