Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2632 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 25, 2022