Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022